Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Korduba, Laryssa, against Redacted Annuitant, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House134th District Court |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2024ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 20, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: February 01, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 07, 2023MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 31, 2024NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 15, 2024AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 18, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 25, 2024ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 08, 2024NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 31, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: January 29, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: October 29, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 29, 2024DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: December 08, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th DWOP-Rule 165a/Fridays-ProSe DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER ORDER AD LITEM FEES |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER AUTHORIZING AD LITEM FEE ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF PARTIAL PAYMENT RIGHTS MOTION HEARING FIRST AMENDED APP FOR APPROVAL OF SALE (hearing held, ruling issued) |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING AD LITEM FEE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR COMPENSATION OF GUARDIAN/ATTORNEY AD LITEM MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th DWOP-Rule 165a/Fridays Setting DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED ON APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th DWOP-Rule 165a/Fridays Setting DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.