Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Business Flooring Specialists, L.P. A K A, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case against 3I Construction, Llc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manhattan-Byrne-3I A Joint Venture D B A, Manhattan Construction Company, Pacific Indemnity Company, (total of 7) See All represented by Gaswirth, Brad Warren, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2023 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 07, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 07, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 15, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 05, 2023NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER AND MOTION TO STAY ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL AND MOTION TO STAY |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
ZURICH'S ORIGINAL ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - MANHATTAN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY RETURN OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.