Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
E Building Maintenance Corporation, K Building Maintenance Corporation, Kim, Minsuk, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Sethi, Tania, Shaw, Brian Patrick, against Bokf, National Association, represented by Walker, Worthy Waring, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 04, 2023ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: February 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Non Jury Trial |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO PARTIES |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE REGARDING PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT -BOKF, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION D/B/A BANK OF TEXAS RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT BOKF, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION D/B/A BANK OF TEXAS |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE ENTRUST ONE FACILITY SERVICES, INC. |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
APP-WRIT OF GARNISHMENT APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT- BOKF, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.