Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
I-30 Equipment Sales, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ankele, Matthew Jason, against Independent Bank, represented by Mckitt, Stephen Phillip, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 20, 2023ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE
Date: August 01, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: August 27, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 28, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 15, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
193rd Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Initial DWOP Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) MISCELLANOUS EVENT DC-23-10747 ORDER AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER RE: AGREED JUDGMENT ORDER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT ORIGINAL ASNWER-INDEPENDANT BANK ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED NOTICE FOR GARNISHMENT - IRON EAGLE INC. RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - INDEPENDENT BANK RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT INDEPENDENT BANK, A WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF INDEPENDENT BANK GROUP, INC |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE IRON EAGLE INC. D/B/A IRON EAGLE EXCAVATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.