Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Healthrecon Connect Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cook, Darrell W, against Popular Bank, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDMOND, AIESHA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryGarnishment |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: July 18, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 20, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 19, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 20, 2023ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: September 18, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT MAILED NOTE - CLERKS |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-SERVE ORDER OF NONSUIT MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
160th Dismissal DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION CASE FILED 7-18-23; DEF AND DEBTOR UNSERVED |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: NOTICE & ORDER OF NONSUIT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: NOTICE & ORDER OF NONSUIT |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT - POPULAR BANK RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE CLINICAL LABORATORY INC |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT POPULAR BANK |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AND NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.