Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stimpson, L. Mel, Jr, against Correa, Alfonso L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2023 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 31, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 08, 2023MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION (hold for AJ/DJ/FJ) |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - ALFONSO L CORREA RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
June 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SUBST SERVICE ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN TO SUBST SERVICE MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SUBST SERVICE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO SUBST SERVICE |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC-23-07175 NDWOP NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.