Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Morgan, Rolando, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alvarado, Daniella, against Miller, Desiree, Thomas, Markeith, represented by Clark, Melanie Mccaffree, Engelmann, Laurel Robin, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 19, 2024ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 23, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 18, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: August 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: May 02, 2024ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 02, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: July 07, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 06, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2024AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 08, 2023DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: August 08, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 10, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NONSUIT | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION ROLANDO MORGAN |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - DESIREE MILLER CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION DESIREE MILLER |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - MARKEITH THOMAS RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL FIRST |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CITATION MARKEITH THOMAS |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION-MARKEITH THOMAS ISSUE CITATION |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE AMENDED PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.