Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Webster, James, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Webster, James M, against Carrizales, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2023 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 23, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 25, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 16, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: May 29, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 10, 2023MOTION - TRANSFER - CHANGE OF VENUE
Date: June 23, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 28, 2023ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: July 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 08, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 09, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: August 08, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 18, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 18, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: August 18, 2023Motion - Strike
Date: August 18, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SENT SELF REPRESENTATION INFO TO D |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference SENT NOTICE TO D AT BOTH ADDRESSES ON AFF INABILITY TO PAY |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM COUNTER CLAIM |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION COUNTER STRIKE THE PLAINTIFF'S TWO SANCTIONS MOTION - STRIKE COUNTER STRIKE THE PLAINTIFF'S TWO SANCTIONS |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE Motion - Strike P/M/STRIKE, 30M, KAITY WEBSTER, 469-350-3386 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION & RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE OBJECTION & RESPONSE TO MOTION STRIKE |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
2ND MOTION STRIKE & FOR SANCTIONS MOTION - STRIKE 2ND - & MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.