Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Knez Capital, Llc, Knez Group, L.P., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Griffith, Joseph P., Wallace, Jeremy R., against Brandt, Kiel Brendan, Epsilon Acquisition Services, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2023 |
CategoryForeign Judgment (Cv) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 28, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 26, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: June 27, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR JEREMY R WALLACE RETURNED MAIL |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Initial DWOP Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT CREDITORS PROOF MAILING MISCELLANOUS EVENT PLAINITFF JUDGMENT CREDITORS PROOF OF MAILING |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF S. MOHSIN REZA AFFIDAVIT |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PETITION TO ENFORCE FOREIGN JUDGMENT MOTION - MISCELLANOUS |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.