Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Inbox Moving Service, Llc, filed a(n) Bill Of Review (Civil) case represented by Feltoon, Jason Scott, against Barnes, Maryann, represented by Cook, Darrell W, Davis, Stephen W., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2023 |
CategoryBill Of Review (Civil) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House298th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: March 01, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: March 13, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 17, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 05, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2023COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: September 13, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: September 11, 2023COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER
Date: September 21, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: December 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
REGARDING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLNT'S BILL OF REVIEW COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE RE: BILL OF REVIEW CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE TO JUDGE RE: BILL OF REVIEW |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - REBECCA AGUERO RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - JORGE AGUERO RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
REGARDING BILL OF REVIEW COA - CORRESPONDENCE LETTER |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF BRIEF IN SUPP OF BILL OF REVIEW BRIEF FILED PLAINTIFF BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF BILL OF REIEW |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
1ST AMD PETITOIN BILL OF REVIEW AMENDED PETITION 1ST AMENDED PETITION FOR BILL OF REVIEW |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITION FOR BILL OF REVIEW NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITION FOR BILL OF REVIEW MOTION HEARING (IN PERSON) 30M ANGIE 214-368-4686 (set by defendant) o'kd per judge BILL OF REVIEW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.