Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Independent Savings Plan Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Miller, Lori Olenick, Sayer, Brian G, against Raygoza, Omar, Ruiz Hernandez, Ana, represented by Jaffer, Shawn, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2023 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2023Scheduling Conference
Date: August 11, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: May 31, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 28, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 16, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 23, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: November 28, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: November 07, 2023ORDER - RETAIN CASE ON DOCKET
Date: June 28, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Generic Reset Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION - CONTINUANCE | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF MSJ MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF RULE 185 & BUSINESS AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT RULE 185 & BUSINESS AFFIDAVIT |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT ISO SJ AFFIDAVIT |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY FEES AFFIDAVIT |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.