Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williams, Chadwick, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Steffey, Brandon H, against Kandeh, Shar, Osburn Trucking Llc, represented by Jones, Lamar L, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 15, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: February 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 22, 2023MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: July 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 18, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: March 19, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 24, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 30, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION SHAR KANDEH |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION PRIME DIAGNOSTICS IMAGING - BILLING CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION PRIME DIAGNOSTICS IMAGING - BILLING |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION PRIME DIAGNOSTICS IMAGING - MEDICAL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION PRIME DIAGNOSTICS IMAGING - MEDICAL |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO TEXAS HEALTHCARE NECK & BACK CLINICS, PA - MEDICAL CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TEXAS HEALTHCARE NECK & BACK CLINICS, PA - MEDICAL |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO TEXAS HEALTHCARE NECK & BACK CLINICS, PA - BILLING CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TEXAS HEALTHCARE NECK & BACK CLINICS, PA - BILLING |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO TEXAS HEALTHCARE NECK & BACK CLINICS, PA - RADIOLOGY CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION TEXAS HEALTHCARE NECK & BACK CLINICS, PA - RADIOLOGY |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF/MOTION BIFURCATE TRIAL MOTION - BIFURCATE DEF (OSBURN TRUCKING LLC)/ MOTION BIFURCATE TRIAL |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO BIFURCATE TRIAL (DEF) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF NOTICE FILING BUSINESS RECORDS AND AFFIDAVITS AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.