Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Walia & Sons Real Estate Inc, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Song, Tailim, against City Of Dallas, City Of Dallas Permit And License Appeal Board, Dallas Police Department, represented by Spaniol, Andrew G, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House44th District Court |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition filed by Walia & Sons Real Estate Inc against the City of Dallas, Dallas Police Department, and the City of Dallas Permit & License Appeal Board. The plaintiff alleges that they have exhausted all adm...
NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 21, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 10, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2023PLEA TO JURISDICTION
Date: March 17, 2023SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: March 17, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: March 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023Plea to Jurisdiction
Date: October 04, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (JURY) | |
August 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLEA TO JURISDICTION Plea to Jurisdiction D/PLEA TO JURIDSICTION, 1HR, ANDREW SPANIOL, 214-670-3490 |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLEA TO JURISDICTION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON PLEA TO JURISDICTION |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIC EOF HEARING ON PLEA TO JURISDICTION NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON PLEA TO JURISDICTION |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL - JURY |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conference | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER - UNIFORM / LEVEL 3 |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3) NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT - UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER (LEVEL 3) |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.