Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
First Mercury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Smith, Kayleigh Kristine, against Lozano Dba Ml Concrete, Miguel, Lozano, Miguel, Mlozano Concrete Inc, represented by Clark, Tom C, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
DISCOVERY
Date: February 22, 2024CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 29, 2024NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 21, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: March 22, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 14, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 29, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 29, 2024MOTION - DISMISS
Date: March 28, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 19, 2024RULE 166
Date: February 22, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: May 03, 2023MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 29, 2024ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 24, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 21, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 22, 2024ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 25, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: April 24, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023Motion - Dismiss
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 28, 2023ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: March 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 21, 2024ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 30, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 19, 2024SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 20, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 27, 2023RESPONSE
Date: April 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (NON JURY) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: UNOPPOSED PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: UNOPPOSED PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE UNOPPOSED |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
UNOPPOSED PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S 2ND SUPPLEMENTED PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES DISCOVERY |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S RULE 166 RULE 166 PLAINTIFF'S |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
MIGUEL LOZANO'S AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL MIGUEL LOZANO |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
MLOZANO CONCRETE INC'S AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL MLOZANO CONCRETE INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.