Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Crawford, Rose Skinner, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Guerrero, Rogelio, against Eke, Uzoma, represented by Shehane, Julie A., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2023 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
This is the plaintiff's original petition filed by Rose Skinner Crawford against Uzoma Eke in the 134th Judicial District Court in Dallas County, Texas. Crawford is suing Eke for negligence related to an automobile collision that occurred on June 16,...
Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 01, 2024CHARGE OF COURT
Date: March 01, 2024MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 28, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 01, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 01, 2024Motion - Compel
Date: October 03, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 01, 2024JURY DEMAND
Date: April 20, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 28, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 07, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: December 22, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 19, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 24, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 23, 2024DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 25, 2024CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 28, 2024CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: January 24, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 24, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: September 07, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: December 22, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 26, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2024ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 30, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: December 22, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 23, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: July 19, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: January 29, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: MOTION & ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: MOTION & ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S PROPOSE JURY CHARGE CHARGE OF COURT DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE DEFENDANT'S |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT'S TRIAL |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT'S |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.