Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
O Foreclosure, Poa Of The Sanctuary At Lake Ridge, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Austin, Judd A, Jr, against Occupant, Rahhal, Feras, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 15, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 07, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 16, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: January 19, 2023Foreclosure
Date: May 11, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: July 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: May 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOH FORCLOSURE ORDER - OCCUPANT RETURNED MAIL |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
95th Foreclosure Hearing Foreclosure |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR Set for Foreclosure Hearing. Notice mailed to counsel and to Respondent(s). |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
SOLDIER'S AND SAILOR'S AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANBGE OF FIRM ADDRESS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS HENRY ODDO AUSTIN & FLETCHER, PC |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL OCCUPANT-CERTIFIED MAILER- BUT NOT REQUIRED PURSUANT TO TRCP 736.3(B)(2) |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL OCCUPANT-MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.