Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Silver Creek Transport, Llc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Barron, Ben K, against Bennche, Llc, represented by Vassar, David Sloan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2022 |
CategoryForeign Judgment (Cv) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 08, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 08, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 15, 2022Motion - Vacate
Date: February 15, 2023MOTION - WITHDRAW MISC
Date: January 23, 2023MOTION - VACATE
Date: January 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT (BENNCHE, LLC) Motion - Vacate 15 MINS - D/M/VACATE - DAVID 972 371 2411 * IN PERSON |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT (BENNCHE) NOTICEOF WITHDRAW OF MTN VACATE JUDGMENT MOTION - WITHDRAW MISC |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: DEFENDANT MTN VACATE |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT (BENNCHE, LLC) MOTION - VACATE (MTN TO WITHDRAW 01/23/23) |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF PROOF OF MAILING NOTICE OF FILING OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DOMESTICATION OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT AFFIDAVIT |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL PETITION | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NEW CASE FILED (OCA) - CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.