Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hoist Fitness Systems, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Adeyemo, Megan M, against Fitco Fitness Equipment Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 28, 2022APPLICATION FOR WRIT/ATTACHMENT
Date: December 06, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 09, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: January 20, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: February 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: February 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: January 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAILED COPAY ORDER TO MEGAN M ADEYEMO NOTE - CLERKS COPY ORDER TO PLAINTIFF |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference EMAILED 2/10 DATE, NO NOTICE MAILED |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED CITATION - FITCO FITNESS EQUIPMENT LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference P CANCELED 1/20 HEARING |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE WRIT OF ATTACHMENT MOTION HEARING P/APP FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, 30M, ANITA SOTO, 214-231-4755 |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - WRIT OF ATTACHMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING APPLIC FOR EX PARTE WRIT OF ATTACHMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING APPLIC EX PARTE WRIT OF ATTACHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.