Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nguyen, Nam Van, Pham, Thanh Duy, Vu, Hoa Thi, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Turley, Linda, against Harshit S. Rao M.D. D B A 02 Pulmonary 7 Sleep Clininc At Grapevine, Le, Tranh-Truc Ngoc, Nannapaneni, M.D., Srikani, Rao, M.D., Harshit, Sani, M.D., Shahram, (total of 8) See All represented by Cooley, Susan Cassidy, Pauley, Bruce A., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 68th District Court with HOFFMAN, MARTIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House68th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 17, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: December 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2023MOTION - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: February 17, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE MEDIATOR
Date: February 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 08, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: August 08, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 01, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 21, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 13, 2023ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: February 08, 2023ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: February 21, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 28, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: June 13, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: July 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 17, 2023ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER - LEAVE
Date: July 27, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: January 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: January 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 31, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 26, 2023Minor Prove Up
Date: October 02, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 12, 2023MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 17, 2023MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: August 15, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 17, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 31, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 05, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER - JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 15, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 05, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 16, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 26, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 18, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 24, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 26, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 03, 2023ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 03, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 16, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 14, 2023VACATION LETTER
Date: September 19, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
68th Court-Jury Trial Setting Jury Trial - Civil 2ND TRL RESET - MLD NTCS TO ALL PARITES |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
68th Court-Jury Trial Setting Jury Trial - Civil 1ST TRL SETTING -ASSIGNED A MEDIATOR MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
68th Court-Cover Pg for Level 1/2 Sch Order or Med Order Jury Trial - Civil 1ST TRL SETTING - ASSIGNED A MEDIATOR AND MLD NTCS TO ALL PARTIES |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-SERVE - ORDER FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE COVER LETTER - ORDER FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR PARTIAL AGREED JUDGMENT MISCELLANOUS EVENT E-SERVE - COVER LETTER - ORDER OF PARTIAL AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD SIGNED GAL ORDER ON FEES TO CLERKS |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM Minor Prove Up KELI WARD * 214-720-0720 VIA ZOOM 30M |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - ADMINISTRATOR FWD ORDER TO JUDGE FOR GAL FEES |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR AGREED JUDGMENT ORDER - JUDGMENT PARTIAL AGREED AS TO THANH-TRUC NGOC LE, AND TRUCARE DENTAL, P.A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.