Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Skates, Crystal, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lee, Ana K, against Palacios, Liliana, represented by Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 17, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2022CONSIDER ON SUBMISSION
Date: December 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: April 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 15, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: May 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 17, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: January 24, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 28, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 31, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 28, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: October 03, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Non Jury Trial |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST DEFENDANTS |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANTS |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED IN LIMINE ORDER NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANTS |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL FIRST |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.