Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Norris, Stormie, Rodriguez, Osvaldo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hashemi, Shawn Saeed, Kingery, Kory, Moussavi Harami, Seyedeh Yasamin, against Phan, Amy Michelle, Rodriguez, Osvaldo, represented by Breeze, Johnny W, Tapscott, William Ken, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 07, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT
Date: January 11, 2024DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: March 30, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2024SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 08, 2022ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: November 13, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 23, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 25, 2023CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: September 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER - CONSOLIDATE
Date: April 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 05, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: February 28, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 28, 2024MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 19, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 22, 2024Motion - Continuance
Date: March 01, 2024EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 28, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 20, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: December 05, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: February 28, 2024NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: January 10, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 28, 2024VACATION LETTER
Date: June 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 19, 2024DISCOVERY
Date: February 05, 2024MOTION - CONSOLIDATE
Date: March 27, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 11, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 05, 2024MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 28, 2023OBJECTION
Date: February 05, 2024ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (JURY) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Motion - Continuance D/M/CONTINUANCE, 30M, MONICA HUGHLEY, 903-813-1900 |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JURY CHARGE | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT'S |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT'S |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING - MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT 3/1/24 10:00 MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - AMY PHAN CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION AMY PHAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.