Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brown , Eric, Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hyde, Richard, Meredith, Randall Lewis, Stone, Seth Adam, against Aguebor , Tony Eyangbon, Uber Technologies, Inc, represented by Dorsett Jr, C Robert, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 20, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2023MOTION - SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER - PROTECT
Date: February 28, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: February 20, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 06, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 03, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: March 09, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 16, 2023MOTION - RECONSIDER
Date: March 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: May 25, 2023DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: March 30, 2023MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: August 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 22, 2022MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 17, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: February 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 27, 2023MOTION - PROTECT
Date: February 27, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: June 30, 2023VACATION LETTER
Date: June 12, 2023ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: June 13, 2023MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 20, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 24, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 03, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 25, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 25, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 24, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: December 02, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: November 11, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 22, 2022ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: June 30, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: June 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 30, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 10, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: July 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 24, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Jury Trial Notice Whitmore Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF MTN WITHDRAW CNSL MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER (PL) MTN WITHDRAW CNSL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER AGREED CONTINUANCE ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER AGREED CONTINAUNCE |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MTN CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE AGREED |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER AGREED CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER AGREED CONTINUANCE |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER (DF) MTN COMPEL MEDIATION NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER (DF) COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT MTN COMPEL MEDIATION MOTION - COMPEL MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.