Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mosco, Rose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Panuthos, Thomas A, against Miller, Sandra, represented by Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 06, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 06, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 10, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 17, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 28, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 19, 2022RULE 11
Date: September 28, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: July 10, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: September 14, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: July 10, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: July 10, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 17, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 28, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 28, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: July 17, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED & BAILIFF FEE CHARGE TO DEF |
|
July 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMT |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COURT FILING AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER Jury Trial - Civil Both ready 1 day 3 wits |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil Both ready 1 day 3 wits (case tried & concluded) |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.