Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Carrera, Francisco, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Garcia, Juan M., against Vazquez, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2022 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 25, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: May 05, 2023MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 10, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 13, 2022MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: March 13, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 17, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 16, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 06, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO PEDRO VAZQUEZ RETURNED MAIL NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SENT TO PEDRO VAZQUEZ |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPROVE SALE MOTION - MISCELLANOUS RECEIVER'S MOTION TO APPROVE SALE |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
RECEIVER'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF SALE MISCELLANOUS EVENT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF RECEIVER'S MOTION TO APPROVE SALE |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT APPROVE SALE OF PROPERTY |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
OATH OF RECEIVER MISCELLANOUS EVENT OATH |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION MAILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.