Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hauder, Sharis, Mattar, Gigi, against Arukwe, Nkechinyere, represented by Clark, Robert M, Dickson, Donald W., Ii, Layer, Ervin Frank, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2022 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
JURY DEMAND
Date: August 18, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: April 26, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 09, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2023VACATION LETTER
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 17, 2024MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: November 07, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: July 31, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 14, 2022Motion - Withdraw
Date: November 17, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: July 31, 2023ORDER - LEAVE
Date: August 24, 2023ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: February 06, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2023THIRD PARTY ACTION
Date: January 08, 2024ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 08, 2024ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 20, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: October 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: September 07, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 21, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 14, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: July 20, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 14, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 18, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 11, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 08, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 17, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil ONE DAY PER P |
|
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL SETTING (JURY) | |
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT ESERVED COVER LETTER - ORDER WITHDRAWING COUNSEL |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST EXHIBIT LIST ADN WITNESS LIST, DEFENDANT'S |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT DEFENDANT ARUKWE'S PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
CITATION GASHAW YIMANAA HAMZA |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ARUKWE S THIRD PARTY COUNTER PETITION AGAINST GASHAW HAMZA THIRD PARTY ACTION |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ISSUE CITATION-GASHAW YIMANAA HAMZA ISSUE CITATION |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ANSWER - DEFENDANT ARUKWE S AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL DEFENDANT ARUKWE S AMENDED ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.