Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Metroplex Carrollton Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Welton, Jamie R, against Iwg Global Investments Sarl, Rgn-Carrollton I, Llc, represented by Gillian, Jaclyn, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 29, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 02, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 06, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: October 14, 2022MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 10, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 15, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: November 10, 2022MOTION - DISMISS
Date: January 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY ALL |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF MTN DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON PARTIAL SJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER ON PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMT |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFS RESPONSE TO MTN FOR SJ Motion - Summary Judgment 30 MINS - P/M/SJ - KAREN 214 257 7220 ** ZOOM |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS TRADITIONAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS ***COURTESY BINDER DELIVERED RE MSJ HEARING*** |
|
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
EXECUTED PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - TXRE PROPERTIES LLC RETURN OF SERVICE |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MSJ NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MTN SJ |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO STRIKE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.