Case Last Refreshed: 11 hours ago
Snell, Leslie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bebawi, Jessica Renae, Patin, David M, Jr, Zehaie, Yoel, against Galeas, Nidia Rodas, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 17, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: February 15, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: April 01, 2024Final Disposition Hearing
Date: November 28, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: January 09, 2023ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 20, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 20, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: November 07, 2022MOTION - REINSTATE
Date: March 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: April 11, 2023MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: November 23, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: July 20, 2023E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER
Date: March 25, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 23, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
NO ACTIVITY LETTER Final Disposition Hearing |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
ES DEFAULT JUDGMENT E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULT JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER DEFAULLT JUDGMENT |
|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER - REINSTATE (OCA and REOPEN CASE) | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS 1ST AMENDED DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Reinstate CONFERENCE CALL |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT CONFERENCE CALL |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO REINISTATE MOTION - REINSTATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.