Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Hernandez, Jesus, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Arnell, Chris, Fifer, Marcus Lamone, against Goodleap, Llc, Southern Solar, Llc, represented by Averill, Martin P, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 95th District Court with PURDY, MONICA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2022 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House95th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: November 13, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: January 08, 2024MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: November 07, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: December 06, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 24, 2024ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: November 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: November 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: November 29, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2024MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 16, 2023OBJECTION
Date: November 13, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 24, 2023MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: November 13, 2023Motion - New Trial
Date: February 21, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: February 21, 2024MOTION - JUDGMENT NOV
Date: January 08, 2024STRIKE SHEET
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER - LEAVE
Date: November 27, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: November 21, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: December 05, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 21, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: December 01, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 20, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: November 15, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 30, 2024Final Disposition Hearing
Date: December 29, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 01, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 21, 2023RULE 11
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 24, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: September 26, 2023ORDER - PARTIAL NONSUIT
Date: February 15, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: January 31, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 13, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: November 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 15, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 03, 2022SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: September 19, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2022PLEA IN ABATEMENT
Date: September 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 11, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 11, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEF'S MOTIONS JUDGMENT NOV AND NEW TRIAL Motion - New Trial JOANNA 346-221-7533 30M IN-PERSON CCREQ |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEF'S MOTIONS JUDGMENT NOV AND NEW TRIAL MOTION HEARING JOANNA 346-221-7533 15M IN-PERSON CCREQ |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF AMENDED SUPERSEDEAS BOND MISCELLANOUS EVENT |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | BOND FILED | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEF'S MOTIONS JUDGMENT NOV AND NEW TRIAL NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENDED, ON DEF'S MOTION JUDGMENT NOV AND MOTION NEW TRIAL |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT SUPERSEDEAS BOND RECEIPT |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT & ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | BOND FILED | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOT WITHSTANDING THE VERDICT MOTION - JUDGMENT NOV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.