Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Open Infra, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fein, Eric D, against At&T, Inc., Earls Construction Company, Machado, Raul Enrique, R & C Utility And Construction Llc, represented by Armstrong, Marrick, Aufricht, Jennifer Decham, Booker, Amber W, Gray, Greg Clay, Hansen, Christopher P, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 06, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 06, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 20, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: September 08, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 09, 2022RULE 11
Date: October 03, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 22, 2022MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: January 23, 2023RULE 11
Date: December 08, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 21, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 08, 2023VACATION LETTER
Date: June 07, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 07, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 17, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 30, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 10, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 08, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 21, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: March 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 26, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 28, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: May 25, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 07, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 28, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 19, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: August 09, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 30, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 05, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 21, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 17, 2023MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 10, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 27, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 19, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Compel VICKIE 214/522-9596 CC REQ |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE MOTION - COMPEL SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION COMPEL & EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION COMPEL & EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE MOTION - COMPEL & EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COUNTER CLAIM | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH MOTION - QUASH |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION OF BILLY FREEMAN MOTION - QUASH DEPOSITION OF BILLY FREEMAN |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF RAUL ENRIQUE MACHADO MOTION - QUASH NOTICE OF DEPOSITION-RAUL ENRIQUE MACHADO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.