Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hollis, Whittnee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Valencia, Camilo, against Simms, Kendell, represented by Breeze, Johnny W, Carpenter, Alexandria K, Clark, Hillary Luckett, Holcomb, Rhonda D, Kaelin, Molly Jean, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 13, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 13, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 05, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: May 22, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: May 22, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 07, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 08, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 22, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: May 22, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: December 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: October 10, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 10, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 02, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 04, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: December 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 02, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: May 22, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 02, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 02, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: June 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 02, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: June 02, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 06, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 07, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: June 12, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: July 14, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: August 28, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: June 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED BAILIFF FEE CHARGED TO DEF |
|
August 05, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Fridays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC-22-06437 NFDH FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Jury Trial - Civil BOTH READY / 2 days 2-4 wits w/expert (case tried & concluded) |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.