Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Marmon, Kimberly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Norris, Christopher B, Reynolds, Debra S, Reynolds, Russell R, against Duran, Transito, represented by Bobier, Kila Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 14th District Court with MOYE', ERIC presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House14th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 08, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 08, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 13, 2022RULE 11
Date: March 28, 2023RULE 11
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 06, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 28, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 06, 2023CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: August 25, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 06, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 02, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 14, 2022MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: September 11, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 31, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: September 14, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 19, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 19, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: October 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 21, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: November 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 10, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2022MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: September 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 19, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 19, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 19, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: September 21, 2023MOTION - EMERGENCY
Date: September 25, 2023REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: September 21, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: September 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - KIMBERLY MARMON CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION KIMBERLY MARMON |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial - Civil | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT EMERGENCY CONTINUE |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION CONTINUE MOTION - EMERGENCY CONTINUE |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS TRIAL EXHIBIT BINDERS RECEIVED |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF S EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
1ST AMENDED WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST 1ST AMENDED |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.