Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wang , Qiushi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Demuren, Samantha M.B., against Driver, John Doe, Maverick Utility Construction Inc, represented by Russo, Christina M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 03, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 03, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: June 03, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 05, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: June 21, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: May 09, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 26, 2023JURY DEMAND
Date: August 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: May 26, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: March 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 22, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: June 22, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2022MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: August 19, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 19, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 13, 2023MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: June 23, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 13, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: June 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 23, 2023MOTION - WITHDRAW MISC
Date: June 23, 2023RULE 11
Date: June 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 25, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: August 01, 2023Settlement Conference
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st Dismissal - Settled Settlement Conference |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
PALINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION QIUSHI WANG |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
RULE 11 RE: SETTLEMENT RULE 11 SETTLEMENT |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE MOTION - EXCLUDE |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL Motion - Compel SET BY TED 214-220-5678 |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW DEEMED ADMISSIONS OR STRIKE ADMISSIONS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OFFICERS CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO TEXAS RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 203 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.