Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Badon , Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brittian, Donovan, against Hayes , Kendrick C., Nfi Industries, Inc, represented by Soule, Andrew N, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 162nd District Court with WYSOCKI, ASHLEY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House162nd District Court |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition filed by Robert Badon against Kendrick C. Hayes and NFI Industries, Inc. The plaintiff alleges that on February 27, 2021, while traveling on I-635 in Dallas, Texas, the defendant, Kendrick C. Hayes, c...
CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: September 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: September 23, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 15, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 14, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: February 27, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: March 08, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: April 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: July 20, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: November 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 02, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
162nd Cover Letter Non Jury Trial |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL HEARING | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RECORDS FROM: RUFFIN TRUCKING, LLC - EMPLOYMENT AND PAYROLL RECORDS |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION-RECORDS FROM:METROPLEX DME,PLLC-MEDICAL SUPPLY RECORDS CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RECORDS FROM:METROPLEX DME,PLLC-MEDICAL SUPPLY RECORDS |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RECORDS FROM: COMPREHENSIVE SPINE CENTER OF DALLAS-MEDICAL |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RECORDS FROM: BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE HEALTH-BAYLOR UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER - MEDICAL RECORDS |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
METHODIST CHARLTON MEDICAL CENTER - MEDICAL RECORDS CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
KLLM LOGISTICS SERVICES LLC - EMPOYMENT AND PAYROLL RECORDS CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT INC. CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION RECORDS FROM: PARKLAND HEALTH & HOSPITAL SYSTEM - MEDICAL RECORDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.