Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cobb, Ronda, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Duke, Walker M, Seth, Gagandeep K., against Cesar Chavez Foundation, Riverside Ccf Cb Partners, L.P., Rodriguez, Reynaldo, represented by Fletcher, Douglas D, Thompson, Stacy H, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: February 10, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: May 09, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 09, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 14, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2023RULE 166
Date: August 17, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 17, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 17, 2023RULE 166
Date: August 17, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 22, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 06, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 09, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: December 07, 2022VACATION LETTER
Date: April 03, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 06, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 10, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 04, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 17, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 17, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 11, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 21, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: April 11, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE 2ND AGREED |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST RIVERSIDE CCF/CB PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A THE PARK AT CLIFF CREEK APARTMENTS AND CESAR CHAVEZ FOUNDATION'S |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES RULE 166 DEFENDANT RIVERSIDE CCF/CB PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A THE PARK AT CLIFF CREEK APARTMENTS AND CESAR CHAVEZ FOUNDATION'S PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT RIVERSIDE CCF/CB PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A THE PARK AT CLIFF CREEK APARTMENTS AND CESAR CHAVEZ FOUNDATION'S |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT MTN IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT REYNALDO RODRIGUEZ D/B/A RODRIGUEZ PAINTINGS REQUESTED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DF RODRIGUEZ ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL AND RULE 166 (e) (l) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES RULE 166 DEFENDANT REYNALDO RODRIGUEZ D/B/A RODRIGUEZ PAINTINGS ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL AND RULE 166 (e) (l) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE DEFENDANT RIVERSIDE CCF/CB PARTNERS, L.P. D/B/A THE PARK AT CLIFF CREEK APARTMENTS ("RIVERSIDE CCF/CB PARTNERS") and CESAR CHAVEZ FOUNDATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.