Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Thomas, Marcus, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcgilberry, Jason, against Dallas Movers South Llc, Hamrick, Noah L., Pioneer Truck Leasing, Sia Transportation Inc., Sia Transportation Inc. Dba Two Men And A Truck, (total of 5) See All represented by Cash, Kelley E, Chamblee, William H, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 101st District Court with WILLIAMS, STACI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, STACI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House101st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 19, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 18, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 19, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 11, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 04, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: February 14, 2022ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: January 19, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: March 04, 2022ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: March 04, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: December 13, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 17, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 17, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: January 05, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: April 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 21, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2023RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 04, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 29, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: April 04, 2022MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: April 27, 2022RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 17, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 27, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 10, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 14, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 18, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: August 03, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 14, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 03, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: April 18, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 10, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL MAILED TO NOAH L. HAMRICK RETURNED MAIL |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTS NOTICE OF NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
EXHIBITS LIST EXHIBIT LIST DEFENDANT'S |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JURY CHARGE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
101st J/NJ Trial Notice 2021 Jury Trial - Civil |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT IN LIMINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.