Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Cruz Romero, Ana, Romero, Nuvia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alford, Jacob R, against Lauber, Joshua Hayes, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Breeze, Johnny W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 22, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 17, 2024PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: April 18, 2024MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 17, 2024ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: August 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: July 07, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2022MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: June 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 15, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 08, 2023DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: January 20, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: February 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: April 25, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: May 15, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 26, 2023OBJECTION
Date: June 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: May 15, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 12, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 23, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 31, 2023ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: November 16, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: November 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 10, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: January 07, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 23, 2022Scheduling Conference
Date: March 22, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 14, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 03, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: April 18, 2024Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil CARRIED FROM 4-22-2024 2 TO 3 DAYS |
|
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
ESERVE ORDER DENY CONTINUANCE E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL NOTICE - DO NOT USE Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICTS CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE 3RD |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
RE: PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER ON PARTIES 3RD AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
3RD AGREED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE W/ REQUEST FOR NEW DOCKET CONTROL ORDER MOTION - CONTINUANCE 3RD AGREED W/ REQUEST FOR NEW DOCKET CONTROL ORDER |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil (Level 3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.