Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mindsight Medical, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Coker, Kaitlyn M., Friedman, Jason H., Winn, Richard W, against Roger Kasendorf Do, P.C., represented by Dooley, Marshal W, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 18, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: October 24, 2022ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: January 04, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 19, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 06, 2022MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 06, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 07, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 21, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: October 20, 2022MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 21, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: April 24, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 01, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 28, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: October 21, 2022RULE 166
Date: February 02, 2023RULE 166
Date: October 20, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: February 01, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: January 17, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2023MOTION - JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: February 27, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: February 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2023RESPONSE
Date: March 03, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: April 20, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 21, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 20, 2023RULE 166
Date: April 20, 2023RESPONSE
Date: May 03, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 01, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: May 01, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 02, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: May 02, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: May 05, 2023Motion - New Trial
Date: July 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: May 30, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: May 18, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2023MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER - NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: May 26, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 07, 2023Motion - New Trial
Date: July 18, 2023Motion - New Trial
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS
Date: September 12, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: August 16, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: August 08, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: August 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2023CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE
Date: September 15, 2023COA - POST CARD
Date: September 14, 2023APPELLATE RECORD
Date: September 21, 2023Motion - New Trial
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
APPELLATE RECORD 05-23-00904-CV CLERK'S RECORD SUBMITTED TO 5TH COA WITH TRACE #56074 |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S RECORD PAYMENT INVOICE 05-23-00904-CV EMAILED ATTORNEY $233.00 |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS 05-23-00904-CV PREPARING CLERK'S RECORD |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
COA - POST CARD - 05-23-00904-CV COA - POST CARD 05-23-00904-CV |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS-DESIGNATION REQUESTED AT TIME OF ACCEPTANCE BY 2PM 9/13/2023 NOTICE OF APPEAL - CT. OF APPEALS |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING NEW TRIAL ORDER - DENY - MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS LETTER BRIEF BRIEF FILED |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NEW TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTS LETTER BRIEF TO COURT BRIEF FILED |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS MTN FOR NEW TRIAL Motion - New Trial 15 MINS - NEW TRIAL - MARSHAL 972 330 4455 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.