Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martinez, Ricardo, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Hernandez, Juan Carlos, against Castillo, Juan Carlos, represented by Deaguero, Richard Joseph, Paz, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 06, 2022DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: March 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 13, 2022ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 20, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: December 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 13, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 17, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 22, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 13, 2022ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 07, 2022Motion - Compel
Date: May 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2022ORDER - COMPEL
Date: May 11, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 08, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: April 10, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 13, 2022ORDER - COMPEL
Date: January 18, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 08, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 06, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: February 06, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: February 06, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: January 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: April 12, 2023FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: April 11, 2023REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: April 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2023MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: April 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 10, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUAN CARLOS CASTILLO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO JUAN CARLOS HERNANDEZ NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW TO ALL PARTIES |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial (Level 2) 1 DAY |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REQUEST FOR FINDING OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT - JUAN C. HERNANDEZ - ATTORNEY FEES AFFIDAVIT ATTORNEY FEES |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF S 1ST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITON AMENDED PETITION 1ST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.