Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Toupal, Brandon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Provost, Christopher K, against Coleman, Kayce, Root Insurance Company, represented by Thompson, Rhonda, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 160th District Court with REDMOND, AIESHA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House160th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This is an original petition for civil action filed in the 160th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiff, Brandon Toupal, is suing the defendants, Root Insurance Company and Kayce Coleman, for damages arising out of a motor veh...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 16, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 16, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: November 16, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: February 15, 2022NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT
Date: January 12, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: January 10, 2022ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: February 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 23, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 14, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 14, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: February 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022Scheduling Conference
Date: April 19, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 21, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 08, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 14, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: March 31, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 06, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 11, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 14, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 08, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 10, 2022ORDER - REMAND (POST JUDG MOTION) (OCA and REOPEN CASE)
Date: March 03, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: February 23, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: March 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 18, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022MOTION - SEVER
Date: May 06, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: July 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 10, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 08, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: January 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: May 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 06, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 11, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 08, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022ORDER - NONSUIT
Date: December 29, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 18, 2022MOTION - DISMISS
Date: December 21, 2022SETTLED
Date: December 07, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury/Non-Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Notice Final Disposition Hearing |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT DEPO CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BRANDON TOUPAL |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER - NONSUIT AGREED |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
MAILED TO CHRISTOPHER K PROVOST NOTE - CLERKS MAILED COPY OF AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE TO ALL PARTIES |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER-AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
SETTLED LETTER SETTLED |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT-NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION-GLEN LAKES ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC DISCOVERY |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT-NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TK DEPO-BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-GRAPEVINE DISCOVERY DEFENDANT-NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION-BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER-GRAPEVINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.