Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gray, Angelia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Patin, David M, Jr, against Doe, John, Hunter, Connor, Sunset Logistics, Inc., represented by Field, M Turner, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 06, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 21, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 12, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 23, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 07, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: February 22, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 15, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: January 10, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 05, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 05, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 05, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 05, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 13, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: February 10, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: February 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 16, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 31, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: September 05, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: April 08, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 16, 2022MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: April 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 18, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 03, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 13, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: May 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 01, 2022OBJECTION
Date: January 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 01, 2022RESPONSE
Date: June 09, 2023NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 26, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: June 15, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: June 12, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 13, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 21, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: June 15, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: July 24, 2023FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: July 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 24, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: August 28, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS COPY TO PLT AND DEF |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MSJ Motion - Summary Judgment 30 MINS - D/NO EVID MSJ - JOSEY 469 374 8416 |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MSJ Motion - Summary Judgment 30 MINS - D/NO EVID MSJ - JOSEY 469 374 8416 (hearing held, under advisement) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.