Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
Mathis, Demetar, Patterson, Anthony, Webb, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rafi, Ayesha, against Barnett, Michael, represented by Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
This is an original petition and request for disclosure filed by Christopher Webb, Anthony Patterson, and Demetar Mathis against Michael Barnett.
The plaintiffs are alleging negligence on the part of the defendant. Specifically, they claim that the...
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 07, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 05, 2024CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 11, 2024NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: July 31, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 15, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: March 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2021PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: March 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 10, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 02, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: March 15, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: February 17, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 20, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 05, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 05, 2022ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: January 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 09, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: November 10, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 19, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 12, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 15, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 07, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 24, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 15, 2023MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: July 05, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil 2-3 DAYS PER P & D |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) LEVEL 3 MV CASE, ACCIDENT WAS IN AN ALLEY |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE TRIAL CONFLICT |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Civil 2-3 DAYS PER P & D |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
TRIAL SETTING (JURY) LEVEL 3 MV CASE, ACCIDENT WAS IN AN ALLEY |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S TRIAL CONFLICT LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED JURY CHARGE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION - MICHAEL BARNETT CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION MICHAEL BARNETT |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.