Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vasquez, Gina, filed a(n) Property case represented by Samavati, Gia, Stewart, Tkisheuna C, against Raising Canes Restaurants, Llc, represented by Carter, Clayton S., Logan, Michael Alan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2021 |
CategoryProperty |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Gina Vasquez against Raising Canes Restaurants, LLC. The plaintiff intends to conduct discovery under Level 3 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure. The claims asserted arise under the common law of Texas, and the jurisdict...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: October 20, 2021Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: December 16, 2022Final Disposition Hearing
Date: February 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2023REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2021RESPONSE
Date: December 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: October 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2021FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: January 26, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 06, 2023Motion - Quash
Date: January 20, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: February 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 19, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: March 28, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 09, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 26, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: October 21, 2022MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 26, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: November 10, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 11, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: November 09, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 24, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: November 14, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 10, 2022RESPONSE
Date: December 09, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 04, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: January 04, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TRIAL Jury Trial - Civil |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDER DISMISS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC-21-15476 NFDH FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 01/20/23 9:00 MOTION QUASH AND MOTION ENFORCE SETTLEMENT Motion - Quash 30 MIN & MOTION ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PAULA ELLIOTT 214/777-0040 9:00 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 01/20/23 9:00 MOTION QUASH AND MOTION ENFORCE SETTLEMENT NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT 01/20/23 9:00 MOTION QUASH AND MOTION ENFORCE SETTLEMENT |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER RE: MOTION QUASH NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT RE: MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICES OF DEPOSITIONS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
*MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT MOTION - MISCELLANOUS DEFENDANT MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.