Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mosco, Rose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Panuthos, Thomas A, Scheumack, Griffin, Taylor, Austin, against Miller, Sandra, represented by Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 27, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: November 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 11, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 12, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 27, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 29, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: December 13, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 25, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 25, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: September 01, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: August 31, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 01, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: September 01, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 16, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: September 12, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 22, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 31, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: June 22, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 31, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 01, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: June 21, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 12, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: June 22, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: November 03, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 03, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 13, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: February 03, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: September 01, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE FILING PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL PLEADINGS CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PROPOSED JURY CHARGE PLAINTIFF'S |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER IN LIMINE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLTF'S OBJECTION TO DEFTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE DISCOVERY DISCOVERY |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE LETTER RE OBJECTION TO DEFT'S 193.7 NOTICE |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
LETTER RE: DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.