Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rapalo, Delmy, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Nielsen, Eric David, against Escobar, Ana Daysi, Escobar, Noe, represented by Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House134th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 20, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: December 09, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: November 01, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 23, 2022NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 22, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: March 09, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: July 22, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: April 22, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 22, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: July 20, 2022RESPONSE
Date: July 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2022MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 08, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 08, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 08, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: August 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 09, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 08, 2022Motion - Quash
Date: August 25, 2022MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 18, 2022MISCELLANEOUS EVENT
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 19, 2022RESPONSE
Date: August 22, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 22, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 18, 2022Motion - Quash
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: September 07, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: September 09, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: September 09, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: September 09, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 10, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 20, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: July 22, 2022NOTE - CLERKS
Date: October 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION - BIFURCATE
Date: October 19, 2022NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: October 19, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Sheet (General) NOTE - CLERKS ORDER DISMISS TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil both ready 1-2 days, 2-3 wits |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DISMISS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DISMISS |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION BIFURCATED TRIAL MOTION - BIFURCATE DEFNDANTS |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE NONSUIT NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER BIFURCATE CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: BIFURCATE |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER BIFURCATE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT BIFURCATE |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Number Jury Trial - Civil D1-2days, D2wits |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PROPOSED JURY CHARGE | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION - IN LIMINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.