Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Esparza, Cesar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kastl, Kristina N., against Cp&Y, Inc., Skinner, Steve, represented by Alvarado, Daniel, Butler, Clark S, Miller, Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 191st District Court with SLAUGHTER, GENA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSLAUGHTER, GENA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House191st District Court |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition and jury demand filed by Cesar Esparza against Steve Skinner and CP&Y, Inc. The plaintiff seeks monetary relief over $1,000,000 and intends for discovery to be conducted under Discovery Level 3. Cesar...
ORDER - PRETRIAL
Date: October 07, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 23, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 15, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 15, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 03, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 06, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 30, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 20, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 03, 2022MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: April 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 14, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: July 17, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 25, 2023Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 27, 2023OBJECTION
Date: July 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: August 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 06, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: September 14, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2022WITNESS LIST
Date: April 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 18, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: April 18, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: May 01, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: April 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: July 28, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 26, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
191st JURY TRIAL LETTER Jury Trial - Civil |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Motion - Continuance 15M * DEF'S M/CONTINUE * ROXANNA ESQUIVEL 469 916 2552 * VIA ZOOM |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE DEPOSITION CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION BAYLOR SCOTT & WHITE MEDICAL CENTER AT IRVING |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S RULE 193_7 OBJECTION |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S RULE 193_7 NOTICE OBJECTION |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE MOTION - CONTINUANCE |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
REPORTERS CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION STEVEN GLYNN SKINNER CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION OF STEVEN GLYNN SKINNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.