Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilson, Eric, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Smith, Susan B, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Egharevba, Natasha E, Gardner, Kate, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 116th District Court with PARKER, TONYA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePARKER, TONYA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House116th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a plaintiffs' original petition filed in the 116th District Court of Dallas County, Texas. The plaintiffs, Eric Wilson individually and as next friend of minors A.W., J.C., Z.C., and Z.C., are complaining against Allstate Fire and C...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 23, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2021MOTION - GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: September 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: February 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 08, 2022Minor Prove Up
Date: July 01, 2022Status Conference
Date: February 08, 2022Minor Prove Up
Date: May 19, 2022NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: July 06, 2022ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: July 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Non Jury Trial | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING FEES OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Minor Prove Up CONTINUATION OF PROVE UP SET 5-19-20222. HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENCE AND LIVESTREAMED ON YOUTUBE |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - ATTORNEY FEES | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT INVOLVING MINOR |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT 1ST AMENDED REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING FEES OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT RE: GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED AGREED JUDGMENT INVOLVING MINOR NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE PARKER MINOR PROVE UP . ALL PARTIES NOTICED. HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED VIA ZOOM VIDEOCONFERENC AND LIVESTREAMED ON YOUTUBE. HEARING CAN ONLY BE RESET BY JUDGE OR ADMIN |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO INVEST FUNDS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.