Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williams, Rosia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Guerrero, Rogelio, Scheumack, Griffin, against Espinoza, Anthony, represented by Guerrero, Rogelio, Teague, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 24, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 04, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 20, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: November 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 10, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 30, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: August 03, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 23, 2022DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: October 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 06, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 06, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: October 27, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: October 27, 2021DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: March 21, 2022DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES)
Date: June 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 05, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 12, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 30, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: January 19, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: January 19, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 19, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2023PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: January 19, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 18, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: May 04, 2023CHARGE OF COURT
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER - LIMINE
Date: May 10, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: May 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 23, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: May 10, 2023ORDER - LIMINE
Date: May 10, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | VACATION LETTER | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF AGREED JUDGMENT RULE 306(a)(3) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | REACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER - AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT - AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
FILING AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE - FILING AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CHARGE OF COURT | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET - PLAINTIFF STRIKE SHEET - PLAINTIFF |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | VOIR DIRE | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
STRIKE SHEET - DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.