Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Scott, John Patrick, Jr, Scott, John Patrick, Jr., Scott, Kathryn Irish, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Formenti, Caio, Martin, Ben C, against Watson, Henry Weatherby, represented by Moon, Richard Bruce, Westmoreland, Brad K., in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 192nd District Court with ACEVES, MARIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House192nd District Court |
MOTION - PROTECT
Date: December 28, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 09, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 27, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 11, 2023MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: August 25, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: April 12, 2024Motion - Compel
Date: April 22, 2022Motion - Exclude
Date: October 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 08, 2024Motion - Compel
Date: November 30, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 10, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 22, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 06, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 06, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: March 27, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: April 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 06, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: June 23, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: July 26, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: April 15, 2024PRE-TRIAL HEARING
Date: April 15, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER - DENY CONTINUANCE
Date: September 29, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: April 03, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2023ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: December 28, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 24, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 30, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023ORDER - PROTECT
Date: July 01, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 15, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 24, 2022ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 30, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 24, 2022Status Conference
Date: July 01, 2022Motion - Protect
Date: February 18, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 31, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 14, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 10, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 25, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: August 11, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 11, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 11, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 12, 2023RULE 11
Date: December 20, 2021DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 15, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 14, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: January 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 28, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 28, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: April 22, 2022Status Conference
Date: July 01, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
192nd Trial Reset Letter Tenesa Jury Trial - Civil |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
UNOPPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING PROPER PARTY ORDER - MISC. SUBSTITUTING PROPER PARTY |
|
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON STATUS CONFERENCE AND PRE-TRIAL RULINGS PRE-TRIAL HEARING ****Ok to set per Judge** Conference RE: Pretrial matters including Depositons, pretrial rulings and scheduling issues |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLTF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PROPER PARTY MOTION - MISCELLANOUS TO SUBSTITUTE PROPER PARTY, UNOPPOSED |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED UNOPPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING PROPER PARTY NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED UNOPPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTING PROPER PARTY |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - JEREMY SMITH |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON STATUS CONFERENCE AND PRE-TRIAL RULINGS NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON STATUS CONFERENCE AND PRE-TRIAL RULINGS |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED ATTORNEY ISSUED SUBPOENA - JASON MASSEY |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION JOHN SHANNON WATSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.