Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
White, Tommy, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Campbell, Austin P, against Rsi Visual Systems, Inc., represented by Colon-Pol, Yanice, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryEmployment |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Tommy White is suing RSi Visual Systems for age discrimination and retaliation in violation of Texas Labor Code. Mr White was employed by RSi Visual Systems since 2009 and received positive performance reviews. However, he was subjected to harassing ...
ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 30, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 27, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 27, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: September 10, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 07, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 09, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 09, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 09, 2021Motion - Stay Discovery
Date: April 15, 2022CASE FILING COVER SHEET
Date: August 09, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 27, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 08, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: September 10, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 01, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER - COMPEL
Date: November 11, 2021DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: September 10, 2021MOTION - STAY
Date: March 04, 2022RESPONSE
Date: April 11, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: July 11, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: April 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Notice Jury Trial - Civil |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO LIFT STAY MOTION HEARING VIA CONFERENCE* CALL SET BY AUSTIN 214-954-9704 MOTION TO STAY- RESCHEDULED FROM 04/15/22 |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND RE-OPEN PROCEEDINGS Motion - Stay Discovery VIA CONFERENCE CALL * SET BY AUSTIN 214-389-5577 |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO LIFT STAY RESPONSE DEFENDANT S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND RE-OPEN PROCEEDINGS |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO LIFT STAY NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT AMENED ON MOTION TO LIFY STAY |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT ON MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND RE-OPEN PROCEEDINGS MOTION - STAY LIFT STAY AND RE-OPEN PROCEEDINGS |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND RE-OPEN PROCEEDINGS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO LIFT STAY |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | INACTIVATE CASE (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.