Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Weldon Contractors, Llc D B A Weldon Contractors, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nectoux, Todd, against Czot Mgs Llc, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, represented by Conway, Jonathan C, Jeter, Justin Lee, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITMORE, BRIDGETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
Plaintiff is Weldon Contractors, LLC, and defendants are CZOT/MGS LLC and Hartford Fire Insurance Company.
The complaint includes the following causes of action: 1) breach of contract; 2) quantum meruit; 3) payment bond claim; 4) prompt payment inte...
DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 30, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 31, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: September 01, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 26, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 14, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 05, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: July 26, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: September 23, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: May 03, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 23, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: December 15, 2022Non Jury Trial
Date: October 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 22, 2022Motion - Compel
Date: December 15, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 25, 2022MOTION - STRIKE
Date: June 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 15, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 14, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: January 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 10, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: May 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 18, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: February 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 08, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: March 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 24, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 08, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: March 23, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: June 13, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 18, 2023Motion - Exclude
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 21, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: June 16, 2023MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: July 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 01, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 12, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 09, 2023RESPONSE
Date: June 14, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 13, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 15, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: June 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 05, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 22, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 01, 2023Motion - Exclude
Date: August 23, 2023Non Jury Trial
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: PLAINIFF MTN EXCLUDE & MTN STRIKE Motion - Exclude (VIA ZOOM) 30M MARIO 214-369-3008 |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO (PL) MTN STRIKE (DF) AMD ANDWER & CTRCLMS RESPONSE |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING RE: PLAINIFF MTN EXCLUDE & MTN STRIKE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT WELDON'S AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (ZOOM) |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO (PL) MT EXCLUDE TESTIMONY & EVID RESPONSE DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO (PL) MTN EXCLUDE TESTIMONY & EVID |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL CNSL NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEF ADDITIONAL CNSL |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING RE: PLAINITFF MTN EXCLUDE/MTN STRIKE NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT RE: PLAINITFF MTN EXCLUDE/MTN STRIKE |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT OF CONFERENCE RE: M. THOMAS 214-653-7791 Motion - Exclude (VIA ZOOM) 30M (MTN STRIKE) MARIO 214-369-3008 |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT OF CONFERENCE RE: M. THOMAS 214-653-7791 CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE RE: PLAINTIFF MTN STRIKE (DF) AMD ANSWER & CTRCLAIMS |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERT OF CONF. RE: PLAINTIFF MTN EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVID CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE RE: PLAINTIFF MTN EXCLUDE TESTIMONY & EVID |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.